Financial history DAVID NICHOLLS MEMORIAL TRUST

Charity number: 1060251
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 26/06/2020 26/06/2021 26/06/2022 26/06/2023 26/06/2024
Total gross income £5.63k £478 £548 £548 £5.56k
Total expenditure £4.47k £1.51k £1.92k £2.26k £2.42k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A