THE KATHLEEN SMITH FOUNDATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
General Charitable Purposes. Trust is open to applications. Please submit your application to https://funding.ludlowtrust.com
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 06 June 2024
People

1 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 13 February 1997: Standard registration
No other names
- Financial Conduct Authority
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Risk management
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
1 Trustee(s)
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 06/01/2020 | 06/01/2021 | 06/01/2022 | 06/01/2023 | 06/06/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £60.93k | £74.22k | £51.37k | £41.91k | £113.48k | |
|
Total expenditure | £116.54k | £138.10k | £34.09k | £85.90k | £165.79k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 06 June 2024 | 24 February 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 06 June 2024 | 24 February 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 06 January 2023 | 01 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 06 January 2023 | 01 October 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 06 January 2022 | 06 November 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 06 January 2022 | 06 November 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 06 January 2021 | 03 November 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 06 January 2021 | 03 November 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 06 January 2020 | 23 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 06 January 2020 | 23 October 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED ADOPTED 6/1/97
Charitable objects
THE TRUSTEES SHALL HOLD THE CAPITAL AND INCOME OF THE TRUST FUND UPON TRUST TO APPLY THE INCOME AND ALL OR SUCH PART OR PARTS OF THE CAPITAL AT SUCH TIME OR TIMES AND IN SUCH MANNER TO OR FOR THE BENEFIT OF SUCH EXCLUSIVELY CHARITABLE OBJECTS AND PURPOSES IN ANY PART OF THE WORLD AS THE TRUSTEES MAY IN THEIR ABSOLUTE DISCRETION THINK FIT.
Area of benefit
NATIONAL AND OVERSEAS
Contact information
- Address:
-
Ludlow Trust Co Ltd
Tower Wharf
Cheese Lane
BRISTOL
BS2 0JJ
- Phone:
- 01173138200
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window