Financial history BISHOPSGATE SCHOOL LIMITED

Charity Number: 1060511
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/08/2020 31/08/2021 31/08/2022 31/08/2023 31/08/2024
Total gross income £4.52m £4.69m £5.31m £5.91m £6.65m
Total expenditure £4.50m £4.76m £5.10m £5.46m £6.19m
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £78.47k N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income - Donations and legacies £114.17k £400 £80 £114.54k £915
Income - Other trading activities £82.40k £79.64k £0 £160.10k £170.60k
Income - Charitable activities £4.32m £4.61m £5.17m £5.61m £6.40m
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £4.94k £178 £3.31k £31.68k £70.08k
Income - Other £0 £0 £132.02k £0 £0
Income - Legacies £0 £400 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £4.49m £4.72m £5.05m £5.43m £6.16m
Expenditure - Raising funds £17.14k £32.22k £44.65k £37.00k £30.63k
Expenditure - Governance £0 £0 £28.66k £28.10k £0
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0