Trustees BISHOPSGATE SCHOOL LIMITED
Charity Number: 1060511

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
11 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Christiian Marriott | Chair | 20 June 2016 |
|
|
||||
James Jordan | Trustee | 25 November 2024 |
|
|
||||
Stuart Key | Trustee | 25 November 2024 |
|
|
||||
Andrew Walton Harvey | Trustee | 14 November 2022 |
|
|
||||
Sophie Banks | Trustee | 01 September 2022 |
|
|
||||
Conrad Marais | Trustee | 19 April 2021 |
|
|
||||
Dr Jayne Symons | Trustee | 19 April 2021 |
|
|
||||
Andrew Harrison | Trustee | 07 January 2020 |
|
|
||||
Dudley Mills | Trustee | 28 March 2017 |
|
|
||||
Claire Robertson | Trustee | 20 June 2016 |
|
|
||||
Marc David Fisher | Trustee | 22 June 2015 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.