Financial history BURYS SCOUT AND GUIDE HEADQUARTERS

Charity number: 1060544
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/08/2020 31/08/2021 31/08/2022 31/08/2023 31/08/2024
Total gross income £16.46k £11.72k £7.68k £7.69k £9.02k
Total expenditure £7.46k £8.78k £13.14k £7.94k £14.71k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £10.00k £9.91k N/A N/A N/A