YORKSHIRE GARDENS TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Conserve and foster Yorkshire's garden, park and designed landscape heritage. Volunteers undertake research and recording, advice and assist with conservation, support horticulture in schools. Some grants are made for conservation and schools projects in Yorkshire.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 September 2023
People

10 Trustee(s)
15 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Children/young People
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Throughout England
Governance
- 13 February 1997: Standard registration
No other names
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
10 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
CHRISTOPHER CHARLES WEBB | Chair | 04 April 2020 |
|
|||||
Dr Camilla Jane Allen | Trustee | 06 April 2024 |
|
|
||||
Trevor James Nicholson | Trustee | 06 April 2024 |
|
|
||||
Michael Brendan Mowforth | Trustee | 26 March 2022 |
|
|
||||
PROFESSOR GILLIAN MARY PARKER | Trustee | 26 March 2022 |
|
|||||
Roger Lambert | Trustee | 27 March 2021 |
|
|
||||
Madalyn Joy Hughes | Trustee | 30 March 2019 |
|
|
||||
Victoria Price | Trustee | 18 March 2017 |
|
|
||||
PENELOPE DAWSON-BROWN | Trustee |
|
||||||
VALERIE JANE HEPWORTH | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/09/2019 | 30/09/2020 | 30/09/2021 | 30/09/2022 | 30/09/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £17.19k | £7.89k | £14.08k | £19.87k | £14.93k | |
|
Total expenditure | £13.55k | £8.65k | £11.92k | £22.45k | £19.33k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 September 2023 | 24 June 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 September 2022 | 29 April 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 September 2021 | 07 June 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 September 2020 | 24 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 September 2019 | 20 April 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 24 SEPTEMBER 1996 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION DATED 31 MARCH 1999 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 21/03/2015 AS AMENDED ON 12 APR 2018 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION REGISTERED AT COMPANIES HOUSE ON 12 APR 2018
Charitable objects
THE OBJECTS OF THE CHARITY ARE: (1) TO PROMOTE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC ON MATTERS CONNECTED WITH GARDEN LAND. (2) TO PROMOTE THE PROTECTION, CONSERVATION AND APPROPRIATE TREATMENT OF WHATEVER GARDEN LAND MAY EXIST OR HAVE EXISTED IN AND AROUND THE COUNTIES OF NORTH YORKSHIRE, SOUTH YORKSHIRE, EAST YORKSHIRE AND WEST YORKSHIRE FOR THE EDUCATION AND ENJOYMENT OF THE PUBLIC. 1.2 THIS PROVISION MAY BE AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION BUT ONLY WITH THE PRIOR WRITTEN CONSENT OF THE COMMISSION. "GARDEN LAND" MEANS GARDEN, PARK AND DESIGNED LANDSCAPE AND PLACES USED FOR RECREATION OF HIGH AMENITY AND EDUCATIONAL VALUE IN A NATIONAL, REGIONAL, COUNTY OR LOCAL CONTEXT. IT INCLUDES ENCLOSURES, BOUNDARIES, EARTHWORKS, PARK AND GARDEN BUILDINGS, OTHER STRUCTURES AND ERECTIONS AND ASSOCIATED PLANT, MACHINERY AND SYSTEMS, SCULPTURE, GARDEN AND PARK FURNITURE, ORNAMENTAL WOODLAND, PLANTING, GATES, IRONWORK, DRIVES, PATHS AND ROADWAYS, LAKES, WATER COURSES, MEADOWS, AND INCLUDES LAND ASSOCIATED BY VIEW, MANAGEMENT OR OTHERWISE WITH GARDEN LAND. AMENITY AND EDUCATIONAL VALUE? IN RELATION TO GARDEN LAND MEANS LAND WHICH HAS INTEREST: FOR ITS AESTHETIC VALUE OR ITS VALUE AS A WORK OF ART; FOR ITS HISTORIC INTEREST. GARDEN LAND IS OF HISTORIC INTEREST WHEN: IT DEMONSTRATES SOME SIGNIFICANT ASPECT OF THE HISTORY OF GARDEN LANDS. IT HAS SIGNIFICANT HISTORICAL ASSOCIATIONS. IT HAS GROUP VALUE WITH BUILDINGS, MONUMENTS OR OTHER LAND AND THE GROUP IS OF HISTORIC INTEREST. FOR ITS HORTICULTURAL, ARBORICULTURAL, SILVICULTURAL QUALITIES OR POTENTIAL. FOR ITS ARCHITECTURE. FOR ITS SCENIC VALUE. FOR ITS NATURE CONSERVATION QUALITY OR POTENTIAL. FOR ITS ARCHAEOLOGICAL VALUE
Area of benefit
NORTH YORKSHIRE,SOUTH YORKSHIRE, EAST YORKSHIRE AND WEST YORKSHIRE
Contact information
- Address:
-
UHY Calvert Smith
Heritage House
Murton Way
Osbaldwick
York
YO19 5UW
- Phone:
- 01904557570
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window