PENHURST RETREAT CENTRE CHARITABLE TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The Trustees aim to pursue the objects of the charity through the running of the Manor House at Penhurst as a specialist Retreat Centre. The main emphasis is to provide retreat facilities for individuals and small groups returning from stressful environments overseas or within the UK, or preparing to serve overseas through both led group Retreats and the opportunity for private reflection.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

6 Trustee(s)
18 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Accommodation/housing
- Religious Activities
- Other Defined Groups
- Provides Services
- East Sussex
Governance
- 18 February 1997: Standard registration
- 27 November 2024: Funds received from 1115354 SYZYGY MISSIONS SUPPORT NETWORK
- PENHURST RETREAT CENTRE (Working name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Richard William Langmead | Chair | 02 November 2023 |
|
|||||
John Francis MacDiarmid | Trustee | 22 November 2024 |
|
|
||||
Louisa Gail Bailey | Trustee | 10 October 2024 |
|
|
||||
Douglas Roger Wakeling | Trustee | 23 February 2023 |
|
|
||||
John Lowood Richards | Trustee | 23 February 2023 |
|
|||||
DAVID JOHN GREENSLADE | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £248.43k | £121.89k | £177.58k | £243.95k | £223.20k | |
|
Total expenditure | £246.58k | £196.60k | £188.13k | £205.03k | £226.33k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £48.28k | £12.83k | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 09 December 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 09 December 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 07 November 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 07 November 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 23 December 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 23 December 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 19 November 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 19 November 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 30 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 30 October 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
DECLARATION OF TRUST DATED 23 SEPTEMBER 1996 AS AMENDED BY DEED OF VARIATION DATED 30 JUNE 1997 AND 8 OCTOBER 2002
Charitable objects
1) THE ADVANCEMENT OF THE CHRISTIAN RELIGION 2) THE ADVANCEMENT FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT OF RELIGIOUS OR OTHER EDUCATION 3) THE RELIEF OF THE AGED, POOR SICK OR DISABLED.
Area of benefit
U.K. AND OVERSEAS
Contact information
- Address:
-
Manor House
Penhurst Lane
Penhurst
BATTLE
TN33 9QP
- Phone:
- 01424892088
- Email:
- info@penhurst.org.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window