THE LONGFORD CHARITABLE TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
By making grants to organisations the charity helps the general public by promoting general charitable purposes and religious activities.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 05 April 2024
People

5 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Religious Activities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Suffolk
Governance
- 27 February 1997: Standard registration
No other names
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
GEOFFREY MAURICE BUCHANAN | Trustee |
|
||||||
ALISON JANE BUCHANAN | Trustee |
|
||||||
MIRIAM ELIZABETH BUCHANAN | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
REBECCA LUCY BUCHANAN | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
WILLIAM EDWIN BUCHANAN | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 05/04/2020 | 05/04/2021 | 05/04/2022 | 05/04/2023 | 05/04/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £146.10k | £124.30k | £120.20k | £120.20k | £126.23k | |
|
Total expenditure | £150.30k | £117.38k | £116.25k | £120.76k | £120.66k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 05 April 2024 | 03 December 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2024 | 03 December 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 05 April 2023 | 03 December 2024 | 302 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2023 | 03 December 2024 | 302 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 05 April 2022 | 30 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2022 | 30 January 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 05 April 2021 | 03 November 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2021 | 03 November 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 05 April 2020 | 02 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2020 | 02 October 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 9/12/96
Charitable objects
THE TRUSTEES SHALL HOLD THE TRUST FUND AND THE INCOME THEREOF [INCLUDING ANY INCOME ACCRUING OR ACCRUED AT THE SETTLEMENT BUT NOT RECEIVED BY THE PERSON SETTLING THE SAME] UPON TRUST TO PAY OR APPLY THE SAID INCOME AND [IF AND SO OFTEN AS THE TRUSTEES THINK FIT] THE WHOLE OR SUCH PART OR PARTS OF THE CAPITAL OF THE TRUST FUND AS THEY SHALL IN THEIR DISCRETION THINK FIT TO OR FOR THE BENEFIT OF SUCH EXCLUSIVELY CHARITABLE OBJECTS AND PURPOSES [WHICH WITHOUT PREJUDICE TO THE GENERALITY OF THE FOREGOING TERMS SHALL INCLUDE ANY CHARITABLE TRUSTS INSTITUTIONS FOUNDATIONS OR OTHER ORGANISATIONS] IN THE UNITED KINGDOM OR IN ANY OTHER PART OF THE WORLD AS THE TRUSTEES SHALL IN THEIR DISCRETION THINK FIT PROVIDED THAT NOTHING CONTAINED IN THIS DEED SHALL AUTHORISE THE TRUSTEES TO APPLY ANY PART OF THE TRUST FUND OR THE INCOME THEREOF TO OR FOR THE BENEFIT OF ANY OBJECTS OR PURPOSES AS AFORESAID SAVE THOSE REGARDED AS EXCLUSIVELY CHARITABLE UNDER THE LAW OF ENGLAND AND WALES.
Area of benefit
NATIONAL
Contact information
- Address:
-
LOOMSWOOD FARM
HASKETON
WOODBRIDGE
IP13 6JW
- Phone:
- 01473735456
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window