Trustees Denham Village School Fund
Charity number: 1060995

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
9 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Graham Clayton | Trustee | 11 March 2024 |
|
|
||||
Emily Dugan | Trustee | 22 January 2024 |
|
|
||||
Seema Sharma | Trustee | 05 September 2023 |
|
|
||||
Denise O Shea | Trustee | 11 March 2023 |
|
|
||||
Carl Ford | Trustee | 17 March 2022 |
|
|
||||
David Matthews | Trustee | 12 November 2021 |
|
|
||||
Jennifer Holden | Trustee | 01 November 2021 |
|
|
||||
Emily Harrison | Trustee | 05 January 2021 |
|
|
||||
BRUCE GOODWIN | Trustee | 03 January 2020 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.