Register of Charities - The Charity Commission JOHN SWAINE
Charity number: 232526-5
Removed charity
Governing document
INDENTURE DATED 13 AUGUST 1735 AND SCHEMES OF 7 JULY 1885 AND 10 JANUARY 1896
Charitable objects
THE PROVISION OF CLOTHING FOR POOR MEN AND WOMEN OF THE PARISH
Area of benefit
PARISH OF LEVERINGTON
Registration history
- 08 April 1964: Standard registration
- 04 August 1994: Removed
Other names
No other names
This charity is a linked charity of
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.