Charity overview THOMAS SWAINE
Charity number: 232526-6
Linked charity
Governing document
WILL OF 14 FEBRUARY 1725 AND AS VARIED BY SCHEMES OF 7 JULY 1885, 10 JANUARY 1896, AND 29 APRIL 1994.
Charitable objects
TO PROVIDE BREAD FOR POOR WHO ATTENDED DIVINE SERVICE IN THE PARISH CHURCH.
Area of benefit
PARISH OF LEVERINGTON
Registration history
- 08 April 1964: Standard registration
Other names
No other names
This charity is a linked charity of
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.