Register of Charities - The Charity Commission MRS WAINWRIGHT TRUST FOR TONGA

Charity Number: 234518-9
Removed charity
Governing document
LETTERS DATED 07/09/1916 AND 17/02/1917 AS AMENDED BY RESOLUTION DATED 22 JAN 2025
Charitable objects
INCOME TO SUPPORT AN ASSISTANT PRIEST IN TONGA.
Area of benefit
NATIONAL AND OVERSEAS
Registration history
  • 27 November 1967: Standard registration
  • 02 May 2025: Removed (Funds transferred (gi))
Other names

No other names

This charity is a linked charity of