Register of Charities - The Charity Commission THEODORE FEIST

Charity Number: 234518-35
Removed charity
Governing document
LETTER DATED 18TH MARCH 1929 AND MINUTES OF MEETING HELD 8TH OCTOBER 1931 AS AMENDED BY RESOLUTION DATED 22 JAN 2025
Charitable objects
FOR THE TRAINING OF A NATIVE CATECHIST OR ORDINATION CANDIDATE IN THE DIOCESE OF NATAL.
Area of benefit
NATIONAL AND OVERSEAS
Registration history
  • 27 November 1967: Standard registration
  • 02 May 2025: Removed (Funds transferred (gi))
Other names

No other names

This charity is a linked charity of