Charity overview THEODORE FEIST
Charity Number: 234518-35
Removed charity
Governing document
LETTER DATED 18TH MARCH 1929 AND MINUTES OF MEETING HELD 8TH OCTOBER 1931
AS AMENDED BY RESOLUTION DATED 22 JAN 2025
Charitable objects
FOR THE TRAINING OF A NATIVE CATECHIST OR ORDINATION CANDIDATE IN THE DIOCESE OF NATAL.
Area of benefit
NATIONAL AND OVERSEAS
Registration history
- 27 November 1967: Standard registration
- 02 May 2025: Removed (Funds transferred (gi))
Other names
No other names
This charity is a linked charity of
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.