Charity overview MRS M A H MARSH

Charity Number: 234518-114
Removed charity
Governing document
WILL PROVED AT EXETER 24 APRIL 1967 AS AMENDED BY RESOLUTION DATED 22 JAN 2025
Charitable objects
LEGACY TO THE CAMBRIDGE MISSION TO DELHI (CHARITY COMMISSIONERS' SCHEME OF 18TH DECEMBER 1967). AWISH WAS EXPRESSED THAT THE LEGACY BE USED TO PROVIDE BURSARIES AT VICTORIA GIRLS' SCHOOL, DELHI, FOR CHRISTIAN CHILDREN.
Area of benefit
NATIONAL AND OVERSEAS
Registration history
  • 27 November 1967: Standard registration
  • 02 May 2025: Removed (Funds transferred (gi))
Other names

No other names

This charity is a linked charity of