Register of Charities - The Charity Commission BISHOP FISHER LEGACY (SOUTH WEST TANGANYIKA)

Charity Number: 234518-149
Removed charity
Governing document
WILL PROVED AT NORTHAMPTON 8 OCTOBER 1930 AND SCHEME OF 31 DECEMBER 1964 AS AMENDED BY RESOLUTION DATED 22 JAN 2025
Charitable objects
TO PAY THE EXPENSES OF A PRIEST OR BISHOP IN THE FORMER DIOCESE OF NYASALAND TO TAKE RETREAT. INCOME ALLOCATED TO DIOCESE OF SOUTH WEST TANGANYIKA.
Area of benefit
NATIONAL AND OVERSEAS
Registration history
  • 27 November 1967: Standard registration
  • 01 May 2025: Removed (Funds transferred (gi))
Other names

No other names

This charity is a linked charity of