Register of Charities - The Charity Commission MOSSE MEMORIAL FUND
Charity Number: 234518-177
Removed charity
Governing document
STATEMENT RECEIVED 10/11/1964 AND SCHEME OF 29/03/1967
AS AMENDED BY RESOLUTION DATED 22 JAN 2025
Charitable objects
TO MAINTAIN THE HOSPITAL BUILT IN NORTH CHINA IN MEMORY OF REV E H MOSSE. IF INCOME CANNOT BE APPLID IN THIS MANNER IT SHOULD BE APPLIED AS STATED IN CLAUSE 2 OF THE SCHEME.
Area of benefit
NATIONAL AND OVERSEAS
Registration history
- 27 November 1967: Standard registration
- 01 May 2025: Removed (Funds transferred (gi))
Other names
No other names
This charity is a linked charity of
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.