Charity overview PERSE ALMSHOUSE
Charity number: 241971-5
Linked charity
Governing document
WILL OF STEPHEN PERSE PROVED 1/11/1615 U.V. 26 P.241 CHANCERY SCHEME OF 31/7/1841 AND VARIED BY SCHEME OF 5/7/1901
AS AMENDED BY RESOLUTION DATED 05 JUL 2021
Charitable objects
ALMSHOUSES FOR 6 POOR AGED PEOPLE SINGLE OR UNMARRIED PERSONS OF NOT LESS THAN 40 YEARS OF AGE RESIDENT IN THE PARISHES OF ST. EDWARDS AND ST. MICHAEL IN CAMBRIDGE.
Area of benefit
CAMBRIDGE
Registration history
- 19 July 1965: Standard registration
Other names
No other names
This charity is a linked charity of
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.