THE MRS HENRIETTA FRANCES LE PERSONNE BENEVOLENT TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The Le Personne Trust provides sheltered housing for the benefit of elderly needy women in north Tandridge, Surrey, giving priority to those who are, or have been, long term residents of Caterham or, more exceptionally, for the benefit of those living further away but having family connections to Caterham and the surrounding area.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

5 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Accommodation/housing
- Elderly/old People
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Surrey
Governance
- 20 July 1961: Standard registration
- LA PERSONNE BENEVOLENT TRUST (Working name)
- LE PERSONNE HOMES (Working name)
- THE LE PERSONNE TRUST (Working name)
- MRS HENRIETTA FRANCES LE PERSONNE BENEVOLENT TRUST FOR OLD WOMEN FOLK (Previous name)
- Homes England
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
EITHNE WEBSTER | Chair |
|
|
|||||
Lucinda Leigh Steer | Trustee | 28 January 2022 |
|
|
||||
Amanda Jane Cooper | Trustee | 19 February 2021 |
|
|
||||
Patrick Denis Edward Cannon | Trustee | 23 June 2015 |
|
|
||||
ROB RICHARDS | Trustee |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £549.73k | £295.18k | £345.89k | £379.43k | £427.16k | |
|
Total expenditure | £252.30k | £259.78k | £331.75k | £271.30k | £340.00k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Donations and legacies | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Other trading activities | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Charitable activities | £295.66k | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Endowments | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Investment | £1.68k | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Other | £252.39k | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Legacies | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Charitable activities | £233.83k | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Raising funds | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Governance | £6.84k | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Grants institution | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Investment management | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Other | £18.47k | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 11 July 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 11 July 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 08 June 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 08 June 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 19 May 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 19 May 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 22 September 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 22 September 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 01 July 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 01 July 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
WILL PROVED ON 09/10/1939 AS AMENDED BY SCHEME DATED 23/09/1941 AS AMENDED BY SCHEME DATED 17/04/1951 AS AMENDED BY SCHEME DATED 26/03/1976 AS AMENDED BY RESOLUTION DATED 23/10/2013 as amended on 10 Apr 2019 as amended on 28 Jan 2022
Charitable objects
(A) TO CREATE AND ENDOW HOMES AND CHARITIES FOR OLD WOMEN FOLK IN REDUCED OR POOR CIRCUMSTANCES LIVING IN CATERHAM. (B) FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE RESIDENTS OR ANY OF THEM IN SUCH MANNER AS THE TRUSTEES THINK FIT.
Area of benefit
CATERHAM AND DISTRICT
Contact information
- Address:
-
THE OFFICE
LE PERSONNE HOMES
BANSTEAD ROAD
CATERHAM
CR3 5SW
- Phone:
- 01883343685
- Email:
- clerk@lepersonne.co.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window