THE RICHMOND FELLOWSHIP

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Richmond Fellowship (RF) is a national provider of care and rehabilitation for people living with mental health problems, with close to 60 years experience. RF has a subsidiary organisation that has completed a separate annual return. RF offers over 120 facilities, including crisis support, residential, employment and community schemes, well-being projects and domestic violence services.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
Total income:
£51,622,000
Donations and legacies | £63.00k | |
Charitable activities | £50.52m | |
Other trading activities | £0 | |
Investments | £1.04m | |
Other | £0 |
Total expenditure:
£51,610,000
Raising funds | £0 | |
Charitable activities | £51.61m | |
Other | £0 |
£263,000 investments gains (losses)
Total income includes £23,669,000 from 58 government contract(s) and £288,000 from 1 government grant(s)
Charitable expenditure
Charitable expenditure with investment gains
Charitable expenditure
Some charities generate all, or a substantial part, of their income from investments which may have been donated to the charity as endowment or set aside by the charity from its own resources in the past. Such investments usually take the form of stocks and shares but may include other assets, such as property, that are capable of generating income and/or capital growth.
In managing their spending and investments charities need to strike a balance between the needs of future and current beneficiaries. They also need to take account of spending commitments that may stretch over a number of future years. To do this, charities will normally adopt an investment strategy designed to generate both income and capital growth. To maximise returns trustees may commit to investment strategies for several years.
Investments can experience large swings in value so trustees may, in a particular year, decide to realise and spend part of their charity’s capital or to invest part of its income.
By clicking the investment gains checkbox the charitable spending bar is adjusted to take account of capital growth as well as income. This shows the balance the charity is striking, between spending on current beneficiaries and retaining resources for future beneficiaries.
Raising funds and other expenditure | £0 | |
Charitable expenditure | £51.61m | |
Retained for future use | £12.00k |
Raising funds and other expenditure | £0 | |
Charitable expenditure | £51.61m | |
Retained for future use | £275.00k |
People

1152 Employee(s)
7 Trustee(s)
150 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
Number of employees | |
---|---|
£60k to £70k | 3 |
£70k to £80k | 4 |
£80k to £90k | 2 |
£100k to £110k | 2 |
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Disability
- Accommodation/housing
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Other Charitable Purposes
- Children/young People
- People With Disabilities
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- Other Defined Groups
- Provides Other Finance
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Throughout England
Governance
- 20 September 1961: Standard registration
- 24 February 2016: Funds received from 1016959 RICHMOND FELLOWSHIP EMPLOYMENT AND TRAINING
- 25 April 2016: Funds received from 1145283 ISLE OF WIGHT ASSOCIATION FOR MENTAL HEALTH
- 17 May 2017: Funds received from 1025395 THE COUNTY OF NORTHAMPTON COUNCIL ON ADDICTION
- 22 May 2017: Funds received from 1074684 CROFTLANDS TRUST
- 22 May 2017: Funds received from 207893 2 CARE
No other names
- Care Quality Commission
- Homes England
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Danielle Oum | Trustee | 30 May 2023 |
|
|||||
Carolyn Regan | Trustee | 01 April 2023 |
|
|||||
Paul John Najsarek | Trustee | 01 April 2022 |
|
|||||
Susan Anne Moore | Trustee | 01 April 2022 |
|
|||||
Maureen Hopcroft | Trustee | 01 September 2021 |
|
|||||
Ian Edward Ayling | Trustee | 02 June 2021 |
|
|||||
Kapil Bakshi | Trustee | 01 January 2020 |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £46.48m | £46.15m | £47.86m | £47.48m | £51.62m | |
|
Total expenditure | £47.09m | £44.91m | £45.77m | £46.68m | £51.61m | |
|
Income from government contracts | £37.30m | £21.38m | £17.28m | £22.48m | £23.67m | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £187.00k | £111.86k | £352.00k | £288.00k | |
|
Income - Donations and legacies | £196.80k | £96.14k | £69.57k | £187.00k | £63.00k | |
|
Income - Other trading activities | £260.00k | £0 | £292.43k | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Charitable activities | £45.68m | £45.17m | £47.20m | £46.11m | £50.52m | |
|
Income - Endowments | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Investment | £213.00k | £156.00k | £148.00k | £498.00k | £1.04m | |
|
Income - Other | £127.00k | £728.00k | £155.00k | £683.00k | £0 | |
|
Income - Legacies | £191.55k | £36.23k | £69.44k | £120.00k | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Charitable activities | £46.73m | £44.91m | £45.77m | £46.68m | £51.61m | |
|
Expenditure - Raising funds | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Governance | £139.75k | £138.00k | £130.74k | £154.00k | £170.00k | |
|
Expenditure - Grants institution | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Investment management | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Other | £364.00k | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 |
Assets and liabilities
Definitions for assets and liabilities
These are assets, other than investments, which are held for more than 12 months and used to run and administer the charity such as buildings, offices, exhibits and fixtures and fittings.
Long term InvestmentsInvestments are assets held by the charity with the sole aim of generating income which will be used for their charitable purposes such as deposit accounts, shares, rental property and unit trusts.
Investment assets are re-valued every year and included in the balance sheet at their current market value.
Long term investments are held for more than 12 months.
These are assets held generally for less than 12 months such as cash and bank balances, debtors, investments to be sold within the coming year and trading stock.
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liabilityThis is a surplus or deficit in any defined benefit pension scheme operated and represents a potential long-term asset or liability.
Total liabilitiesThese are all the amounts owed by the charity at the balance sheet date to third parties such as bills due but not yet paid, bank overdrafts and loans and mortgages.
Asset / Liability | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Own use assets | £29.77m | £29.77m | £29.78m | £29.00m | £27.47m | |
|
Long-term investments | £448.00k | £538.00k | £484.00k | £62.00k | £2.05m | |
|
Other assets | £21.21m | £24.33m | £27.76m | £29.28m | £29.52m | |
|
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Total liabilities | £12.90m | £14.11m | £15.23m | £15.30m | £15.15m |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 14 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 14 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 31 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 31 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 30 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 30 January 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 29 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 29 January 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 16 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 16 October 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 20/06/1960 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 30/05/1961 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 20/11/1963 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 29/04/1982 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 27/03/2001 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 22/03/2006 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 01/10/2008 NOW ARTICLES ADOPTED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION DATED 12/11/2009 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 31/07/2013 as amended on 30 Jan 2020 as amended on 21 May 2024 as amended on 21 May 2024
Charitable objects
TO PROVIDE A HOME AND COMMUNITY LIFE FOR THE FELLOWSHIP'S BENEFICIARIES; TO ASSIST AND TREAT THE FELLOWSHIP'S BENEFICIARIES; TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC IN ALL ASPECTS OF THE TREATMENT AND CARE OF THE FELLOWSHIP'S BENEFICIARIES; AND TO ADVANCE OTHER EXCLUSIVELY CHARITABLE PURPOSES. "THE FELLOWSHIP'S BENEFICIARIES" MEAN ANY PERSON WHO HAS MENTAL OR PHYSICAL HEALTH PROBLEMS; HAS A LEARNING DISABILITY; HAS PROBLEMS WITH ALCOHOL OR SUBSTANCE ABUSE.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
THE RICHMOND FELLOWSHIP
80 HOLLOWAY ROAD
LONDON
N7 8JG
- Phone:
- 020 76973300
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window