Financial history THE SMITH (HALTWHISTLE AND DISTRICT) CHARITABLE TRUST

Charity number: 200520
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/07/2020 31/07/2021 31/07/2022 31/07/2023 31/07/2024
Total gross income £61.39k £64.15k £70.51k £68.44k £73.11k
Total expenditure £37.93k £32.36k £41.60k £43.41k £53.83k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A