THE SAINTS AND SINNERS TRUST LIMITED

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The charity distributes grants primarily to charitable institutions, trusts and undertakings established for charitable purposes, and thus seeks to enable other charitable organisations to achieve their objectives. It also, in association with the Crime Journalists Association, awards a prize annually for the most significant contribution to co-operation between the Media and the Police.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 October 2023
People

4 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 17 October 1961: Standard registration
- SAINTS & SINNERS (Working name)
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Sir Timothy James Hamilton Laurence | Trustee | 28 November 2019 |
|
|
||||
SIR ANTHONY STUART JOLLIFFE GBE | Trustee | 21 September 2016 |
|
|
||||
NEIL WINSTON BENSON OBE FCA | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
DAVID EDWARDS | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/10/2019 | 31/10/2020 | 31/10/2021 | 31/10/2022 | 31/10/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £76.61k | £48.70k | £77.66k | £77.65k | £79.96k | |
|
Total expenditure | £126.58k | £69.19k | £56.74k | £74.33k | £80.03k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 October 2023 | 27 August 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2023 | 27 August 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 October 2022 | 21 August 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2022 | 21 August 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 October 2021 | 30 August 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2021 | 30 August 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 October 2020 | 20 August 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2020 | 20 August 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 October 2019 | 31 August 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2019 | 31 August 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 31/1/61. as amended on 28 Oct 2020
Charitable objects
ASSISTANCE AND FINANCIAL SUPPORT OF CHARITABLE INSTITUTIONS GENERALLY
Area of benefit
NATIONAL
Contact information
- Address:
-
162 Eden Way
BECKENHAM
Kent
BR3 3DU
- Phone:
- 07973198660
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window