Accounts and annual returns KING'S MEDICAL RESEARCH TRUST

Charity number: 200539
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2024 15 January 2025 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2024 15 January 2025 On Time
Annual return 31 March 2023 15 January 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2023 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2022 13 January 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2022 13 January 2023 On Time
Annual return 31 March 2021 20 January 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 20 January 2022 On Time
Annual return 31 March 2020 26 January 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 26 January 2021 On Time