Financial history KING'S MEDICAL RESEARCH TRUST

Charity number: 200539
Removed charity
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £53.59k £31.47k £26.68k £19.22k £36.05k
Total expenditure £335.81k £74.36k £8.81k £461.48k £62.41k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A