GOD'S HOUSE IN EWELME

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Provision and maintenance of Almshouses.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
Total income:
£1,058,825
Donations and legacies | £0 | |
Charitable activities | £46.36k | |
Other trading activities | £0 | |
Investments | £1.01m | |
Other | £0 |
Total expenditure:
£995,490
Raising funds | £356.09k | |
Charitable activities | £639.40k | |
Other | £0 |
£346,765 investments gains (losses)
Charitable expenditure
Charitable expenditure with investment gains
Charitable expenditure
Some charities generate all, or a substantial part, of their income from investments which may have been donated to the charity as endowment or set aside by the charity from its own resources in the past. Such investments usually take the form of stocks and shares but may include other assets, such as property, that are capable of generating income and/or capital growth.
In managing their spending and investments charities need to strike a balance between the needs of future and current beneficiaries. They also need to take account of spending commitments that may stretch over a number of future years. To do this, charities will normally adopt an investment strategy designed to generate both income and capital growth. To maximise returns trustees may commit to investment strategies for several years.
Investments can experience large swings in value so trustees may, in a particular year, decide to realise and spend part of their charity’s capital or to invest part of its income.
By clicking the investment gains checkbox the charitable spending bar is adjusted to take account of capital growth as well as income. This shows the balance the charity is striking, between spending on current beneficiaries and retaining resources for future beneficiaries.
Raising funds and other expenditure | £356.09k | |
Charitable expenditure | £639.40k | |
Retained for future use | £63.34k |
Raising funds and other expenditure | £356.09k | |
Charitable expenditure | £639.40k | |
Retained for future use | £410.10k |
People

4 Employee(s)
7 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Accommodation/housing
- Elderly/old People
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Buckinghamshire
- Oxfordshire
Governance
- 17 January 1962: Standard registration
- EWELME ALMSHOUSE CHARITY (Working name)
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Margaret Wyn Marshall | Trustee | 30 April 2024 |
|
|||||
Dr Daniel Timothy Richardson Wilson | Trustee | 30 January 2024 |
|
|||||
Michael John Tait | Trustee | 30 January 2024 |
|
|||||
IMOGEN BIRCH REYNARDSON | Trustee | 28 April 2020 |
|
|||||
Rev PATRICK GILDAY | Trustee | 30 January 2018 |
|
|||||
Philip Walter Chamberlain | Trustee |
|
||||||
PATRICK GOSSET | Trustee |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £1.02m | £1.01m | £954.90k | £956.60k | £1.06m | |
|
Total expenditure | £931.48k | £1.07m | £1.03m | £1.35m | £995.49k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Donations and legacies | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Other trading activities | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Charitable activities | £41.76k | £41.18k | £40.53k | £38.46k | £46.36k | |
|
Income - Endowments | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Investment | £973.79k | £973.39k | £913.09k | £918.14k | £1.01m | |
|
Income - Other | £311 | £0 | £1.29k | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Legacies | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Charitable activities | £540.84k | £502.76k | £550.21k | £578.95k | £639.40k | |
|
Expenditure - Raising funds | £390.65k | £566.87k | £475.01k | £772.02k | £356.09k | |
|
Expenditure - Governance | £40.73k | £40.97k | £57.70k | £47.97k | £55.65k | |
|
Expenditure - Grants institution | £3.00k | £280.15k | £313.92k | £282.33k | £105 | |
|
Expenditure - Investment management | £26.42k | £29.22k | £32.07k | £45.80k | £43.21k | |
|
Expenditure - Other | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 |
Assets and liabilities
Definitions for assets and liabilities
These are assets, other than investments, which are held for more than 12 months and used to run and administer the charity such as buildings, offices, exhibits and fixtures and fittings.
Long term InvestmentsInvestments are assets held by the charity with the sole aim of generating income which will be used for their charitable purposes such as deposit accounts, shares, rental property and unit trusts.
Investment assets are re-valued every year and included in the balance sheet at their current market value.
Long term investments are held for more than 12 months.
These are assets held generally for less than 12 months such as cash and bank balances, debtors, investments to be sold within the coming year and trading stock.
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liabilityThis is a surplus or deficit in any defined benefit pension scheme operated and represents a potential long-term asset or liability.
Total liabilitiesThese are all the amounts owed by the charity at the balance sheet date to third parties such as bills due but not yet paid, bank overdrafts and loans and mortgages.
Asset / Liability | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Own use assets | £3.22m | £3.22m | £3.22m | £3.22m | £3.22m | |
|
Long-term investments | £37.92m | £37.76m | £39.33m | £38.42m | £47.95m | |
|
Other assets | £753.18k | £1.23m | £358.48k | £343.37k | £514.38k | |
|
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Total liabilities | £260.86k | £242.66k | £95.14k | £85.26k | £72.68k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 10 September 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 10 September 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 21 September 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 23 September 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 24 August 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 24 August 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 09 September 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 09 September 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 24 August 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 24 August 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
SCHEME DATED 23/06/1953 AS AMENDED BY SCHEME DATED 22/04/1958 AS AMENDED BY SCHEME DATED 15/04/1969 AS AMENDED BY SCHEME DATED 31/03/1976 AS AMENDED BY SCHEME DATED 22/11/1985 AS AMENDED BY SCHEME DATED 08/08/1986 AS AMENDED BY SCHEME DATED 21/07/1992 AS AMENDED BY SCHEME DATED 25/06/1998 AS AMENDED BY SCHEME DATED 30/12/2011 AS AMENDED ON 24 FEB 2011 AS AMENDED ON 17 JUL 2018 AS AMENDED ON 12 JUN 2024
Charitable objects
INCOME TO BE APPLIED TO THE COST OF MAINTAINING THE PROPERTY OF THE CHARITY AND MAINTAINING THE ALMSHOUSES OF THE CHARITY AND FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE RESIDENTS THEREIN. TO MAKE AN ANNUAL PAYMENT AS THE TRUSTEES THINK FIT TO THE CHARITY CALLED THE EWELME EXHIBITION ENDOWMENT. IF THE REMAINING INCOME IS NOT REQUIRED FOR PAYMENTS PREVIOUSLY MENTIONED THE TRUSTEES MAY: A. PAY A YEARLY SUM AS THEY THINK FIT TO THE EWELME EDUCATIONAL FOUNDATION (CHARITY NO. 309281); B. MAKE GRANTS TO OTHER ALMSHOUSE CHARITIES IN OXFORDSHIRE, BUCKINGHAMSHIRE, BERKSHIRE, HAMPSHIRE AND WILTSHIRE C. PREVENT OR RELIEVE POVERTY IN THE VICINITY OF THE CHARITY’S ESTATES IN OXFORDSHIRE, BUCKINGHAMSHIRE AND HAMPSHIRE BY PROVIDING GRANTS TO ORGANISATIONS WORKING TO PREVENT OR RELIEVE POVERTY.
Area of benefit
EWELME
Contact information
- Address:
-
30 St Giles'
OXFORD
OX1 3LE
- Phone:
- 07518 297138
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window