THE WELLS MUSEUM

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The running of a museum relating to the town of Wells and the Mendip Hills
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 May 2024
Total income includes £125,432 from 2 government grant(s)
People

5 Trustee(s)
50 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Somerset
Governance
- 22 December 1961: Standard registration
- THE WELLS AND MENDIP MUSEUM (Working name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Hannah Bennett | Trustee | 08 March 2022 |
|
|
||||
Richard Lovegrove | Trustee | 11 December 2018 |
|
|
||||
SUE ISHERWOOD | Trustee | 18 July 2017 |
|
|
||||
Philippa Threlfall | Trustee | 15 March 2016 |
|
|
||||
MARILYN CATTELL | Trustee | 22 November 2012 |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/05/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £68.16k | £77.74k | £90.52k | £94.82k | £219.20k | |
|
Total expenditure | £67.40k | £56.29k | £62.26k | £117.35k | £751.54k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | £125.43k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 May 2024 | 30 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2024 | 30 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 31 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 31 October 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 03 November 2022 | 3 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 03 November 2022 | 3 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 16 December 2021 | 46 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 16 December 2021 | 46 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 01 December 2020 | 31 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 01 December 2020 | 31 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 15TH OCTOBER 1928 AND ORDER 31 MAY 2006.
Charitable objects
FOR THE RECEPTION PRESERVATION AND EXHIBITION OF OBJECTS OF ANTIQUITY NATURAL HISTORY ART OR PUBLIC INTEREST IN CONNECTION WITH THE CITY OF WELLS AND NEIGHBOURHOOD
Area of benefit
WELLS
Contact information
- Address:
-
WELLS & MENDIP MUSEUM
8 CATHEDRAL GREEN
WELLS
SOMERSET
BA5 2UE
- Phone:
- 01749673477
- Email:
- admin@wellsmuseum.org.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window