THE FRIENDS OF ST PETER'S HOSPITAL, CHERTSEY

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The objects of The Friends are to support the work of the hospital through the provision of, or assistance in the provision of, amenities in St. Peter's Hospital, Chertsey for the benefit of patients, staff and visitors.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 July 2023
People

8 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Surrey
Governance
- 20 February 1962: Standard registration
- FRIENDS OF ST PETER'S HOSPITAL (Working name)
- Complaints handling
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
8 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
PHILIP ANTHONY KEEBLE | Chair |
|
|
|||||
SHARON CATHERWOOD | Trustee | 01 August 2013 |
|
|
||||
FLORENCE HODDINOTT | Trustee | 24 May 2013 |
|
|
||||
GERALD CREASE | Trustee | 24 May 2013 |
|
|
||||
WILLIAM PRESTON | Trustee | 24 May 2013 |
|
|||||
MARY KEEN | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
ALAN HENRY STANNARD GIBBS | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
AMANDA PRESTON | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/07/2019 | 31/07/2020 | 31/07/2021 | 31/07/2022 | 31/07/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £16.58k | £6.16k | £1.24k | £1.70k | £1.69k | |
|
Total expenditure | £58.65k | £17.97k | £1.52k | £253.84k | £111.25k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 July 2023 | 21 May 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 July 2022 | 23 May 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 July 2021 | 23 May 2023 | 357 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2021 | 12 May 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 July 2020 | 15 June 2021 | 15 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2020 | Not Required | Download Open in new window | |
Annual return | 31 July 2019 | 15 June 2021 | 380 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2019 | 25 May 2021 | 359 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION AS AMENDED 9/3/87 AND 1/3/93.
Charitable objects
THE OBJECT OF THE LEAGUE SHALL BE TO RELIEVE PATIENTS OF THE HOSPITAL AND GENERALLY TO SUPPORT THE CHARITABLE WORK OF THE SAID HOSPITAL.
Area of benefit
CHERTSEY
Contact information
- Address:
-
1ST FLOOR CHERTSEY HOUSE
ST PETERS HOSPITAL
GUILDFORD ROAD
CHERTSEY, SURREY
KT16 0PZ
- Phone:
- 01932723867
- Email:
- ahsgibbs@hotmail.com
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window