Skip to main content
CHARITY COMMISSION
FOR ENGLAND AND WALES
Register of Charities
englishcymraeg
Log in to online services

Linked charities SOUTH MOLTON MUNICIPAL CHARITIES

Charity Number: 201790
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Skip to Content
  • Charity overview
  • What, who, how, where
  • Governance
  • Trustees
  • Financial history
  • Accounts and annual returns
  • Governing document
  • Linked charities
  • Contact information
Linked charities
  • AGNES BADCOCK
  • CHARITY OF SIR JOHN ACLAND
  • COMBINED RELIEF IN NEED CHARITY
  • ELIZABETH SQUIRE
  • HENRY HAREWOOD
  • HUGH SQUIER
  • HUMPHREY BAWDEN
  • JAMES BROAD
  • JANE WHITTLE
  • JOAN WEBBER
  • JOHN BAWDEN
  • JOHN GAY
  • JOHN RASHLEIGH
  • JOSEPH PALMER
  • JOSEPH PALMER (1795)
  • JOSHUA HOLE
  • LAWRENCE GIBBON
  • MARY JONES
  • MRS COURTENAY
  • MRS ELIZABETH BAWDEN
  • NATHANIEL SPRIGG
  • NICHOLAS PALMER
  • REVEREND RICHARD BAWDEN
  • RICHARD BAWDEN (1722)
  • RICHARD BAWDEN (1746)
  • THOMAS BROWN
  • THOMAS NOTT
  • WILLIAM GOULD
  • WILLIAM HUNT
  • WILLIAM JONES
Linked charity 201790-7 AGNES BADCOCK
Governing document
SCHEME OF 14 SEPTEMBER 1897 VARIED BY SCHEMES OF 5 FEBRUARY 1963 AND 6 DECEMBER 1966
Charitable objects
GENERAL BENEFIT OF THE POOR
Area of benefit
BOROUGH OF SOUTH MOLTON
Registration history
  • 22 February 1962 : Standard registration
  • 30 April 1996 : Removed

Print charity details Loading
Save and Close

Tell us whether you accept cookies

We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.

We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.

Accept all cookies Set cookie preferences
Was this page useful?

Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window

Charity Commission's privacy notice – how we use your personal information

  • Cookies
  • Accessibility
All content is available under the Open Government Licence v3.0 , except where otherwise stated
© Crown copyright