TORBAY AND DISTRICT DEAF SOCIETY

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The main function a Social Club is to provide deaf members with a stable environment and served those, whos first language is British Sign Language. The club has a rich source of information for deaf, hearing impaired and hearing people. There is a link to local social services and the Church of England and pastoral care.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

10 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- Disability
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Religious Activities
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Amateur Sport
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Human Rights/religious Or Racial Harmony/equality Or Diversity
- Recreation
- Other Charitable Purposes
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Other Charitable Activities
- Devon
- Torbay
Governance
- 01 April 1963: Standard registration
- 17 September 2021: Funds received from 256234 THE DEVON AND EXETER DEAF CHARITY
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
10 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
JONATHAN CHARLES BROWN | Chair |
|
|
|||||
Stephen Downie | Trustee | 30 September 2023 |
|
|
||||
Carolyn Jayne Jones | Trustee | 01 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
Chivonne Michelle Chapman | Trustee | 01 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
Gemma Matthews | Trustee | 01 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
AMANDA JANE LACEY WHITTLE | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
MARCUS JOHN WHITTLE | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
ANDREW KEITH FORD | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
NICHOLAS MALCOLM WATT DOLLAR | Trustee |
|
||||||
MARGARET SHIRLEY FORD | Trustee |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £3.10k | £3.10k | £35.93k | £903 | £7.61k | |
|
Total expenditure | £2.80k | £2.80k | £2.46k | £5.88k | £13.49k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 19 November 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 25 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 14 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 14 January 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 26 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 11 December 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 2ND OCTOBER 1996
Charitable objects
TO RELIEVE AND SUPPORT DEAF AND HEARING IMPAIRED PEOPLE WITHIN THE TORBAY AND SOUTH DEVON AREA
Area of benefit
TORBAY AND SOUTH DEVON AREA
Contact information
- Address:
-
170 WINDSOR ROAD
TORQUAY
TQ1 1SP
- Phone:
- 1800207890500587
- Email:
- pippanik8990@btinternet.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window