THE ANTIENT SOCIETY OF ST STEPHENS RINGERS

Charity number: 203169
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

To contribute towards the maintenance and fabric of St Stephen's Church, Bristol.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 30 June 2024

Total income: £30,595
Total expenditure: £27,917

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

Main way of carrying out purposes is grant making
What the charity does:
  • Environment/conservation/heritage
Who the charity helps:
  • The General Public/mankind
How the charity helps:
  • Makes Grants To Organisations
Where the charity operates:
  • Bristol City

Governance

Registration history:
  • 25 January 1962: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Other
Other names:

No other names

Gift aid:
Recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Financial reserves policy and procedures
  • Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
  • Internal risk management policy and procedures
  • Investing charity funds policy and procedures
  • Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
  • Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

3 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Rev James Harry Johnson Patrick Trustee 29 September 2023
None on record
TOM ANGUS HOOD Trustee 29 September 2022
THE BRISTOL CHILDREN'S HELP SOCIETY
Received: On time
John Andrew Sisman Trustee 01 January 2022
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/06/2020 30/06/2021 30/06/2022 30/06/2023 30/06/2024
Total gross income £35.84k £34.81k £40.49k £26.81k £30.60k
Total expenditure £5.90k £13.48k £35.12k £308.87k £27.92k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 June 2024 13 April 2025 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2024 13 April 2025 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 June 2023 30 April 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2023 30 April 2024 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 June 2022 30 April 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2022 30 April 2023 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 June 2021 04 April 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2021 04 April 2022 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 June 2020 03 March 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2020 03 March 2021 On Time Download Open in new window
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
The Lodge
29 Belvoir Road
Bristol
BS6 5DQ
Phone:
07920806896