BROWN HABGOOD HALL AND HIGDEN CHARITY

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The Charity exists for the relief of the poor and needy, in the Ancient Ecclesiastical Parish of Wimborne Minster.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

8 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Dorset
Governance
- 05 April 1962: Standard registration
- 24 August 1993: Removed
No other names
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Risk management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
8 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||||||||||||||||||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
MRS JILL LAYBOURNE | Chair |
|
|
|||||||||||||||||||||||
Deborah Fleming | Trustee | 19 April 2023 |
|
|
||||||||||||||||||||||
Alison Margaret Francis | Trustee | 07 November 2018 |
|
|
||||||||||||||||||||||
Katharine Anstey | Trustee | 07 November 2018 |
|
|
||||||||||||||||||||||
Rev Canon ANDREW JOHN WILLIAM ROWLAND | Trustee | 07 November 2018 |
|
|||||||||||||||||||||||
MRS Sue Drummond Fowler | Trustee | 25 April 2017 |
|
|
||||||||||||||||||||||
Rev Suzanne Marie PATTLE | Trustee | 21 April 2015 |
|
|
||||||||||||||||||||||
DR ROBIN SADLER | Trustee | 04 November 2006 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £17.10k | £17.83k | £20.76k | £21.68k | £20.13k | |
|
Total expenditure | £17.59k | £16.92k | £18.36k | £20.63k | £21.46k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 25 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 30 August 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 29 April 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 18 May 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 26 June 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
SCHEME OF 16 NOVEMBER 1951, AS AMENDED 27TH SEPTEMBER 1992, BY NOTICES UNDER SECTION 3 OF THE CHARITIES ACT 1985.
Charitable objects
BENEFIT OF POOR AS THE TRUSTEES SELECT FOR THE PURPOSE IN GRANTS OF MONEY AND GIFTS IN KIND.
Area of benefit
ANCIENT PARISH OF WIMBORNE MINSTER
Linked charities
- 05 April 1962 : Standard registration
- 24 August 1993 : Removed
Contact information
- Address:
-
Flat 3
Nea Court
130 Lymington Road
CHRISTCHURCH
Dorset
BH23 4JZ
- Phone:
- 07891006726
- Email:
- bhhh.charity@gmail.com
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window