THE FRIENDS OF THE PRINCESS OF WALES HOSPITAL ELY
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To raise funds for the purpose of providing additional services, comforts and equipment as deemed necessary and appropriate by the trustees in consultation with the hospital management.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 January 2020
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Charitable Activities
- Cambridgeshire
Governance
- 29 November 1962: Standard registration
- 22 December 2020: Removed (Funds transferred (gi))
- 22 December 2020: Funds transferred to 1083876 EAST ANGLIAN AIR AMBULANCE
- 22 December 2020: Funds transferred to 1119279 MAGPAS
- 22 December 2020: Funds transferred to 1133354 ARTHUR RANK HOSPICE CHARITY
- 22 December 2020: Funds transferred to 1069284 EAST ANGLIA'S CHILDREN'S HOSPICES
- 22 December 2020: Funds transferred to 1148000 SERV SUFFOLK & CAMBRIDGESHIRE
- 22 December 2020: Funds transferred to 1077265-1 ST JOHN AMBULANCE
- THE FRIENDS OF TOWER AND ST JOHNS HOSPITALS (Previous name)
- THE FRIENDS OF TOWER HOSPITAL, ELY (Previous name)
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/01/2016 | 31/01/2017 | 31/01/2018 | 31/01/2019 | 31/01/2020 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £649 | £209 | £1.25k | £954 | £954 | |
|
Total expenditure | £6.37k | £2.39k | £5.29k | £1.68k | £1.68k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 January 2020 | 02 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 January 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 January 2019 | 17 October 2019 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 January 2019 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 January 2018 | 18 October 2018 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 January 2018 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 January 2017 | 08 November 2017 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 January 2017 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 27TH NOVEMBER 1962 AS AMENDED 20TH NOVEMBER 1982 AND 10 MARCH 1993
Charitable objects
TO PROVIDE SERVICES COMFORTS OR EQUIPMENT FOR THE PATIENTS OF THE PRINCESS OF WALES HOSPITAL ELY.
Area of benefit
ELY
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window