Trustees THE POOR'S LAND

Charity number: 204546
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

10 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
NIGEL BRETT COLLARD Chair 27 January 2016
None on record
Emma Greatorex Trustee 01 December 2024
None on record
Sarah-Louise Middleton Trustee 26 July 2024
None on record
Brendan Goodjohn Trustee 25 May 2023
None on record
Jonathon Allen Trustee 15 February 2022
None on record
Elliott Spray Trustee 18 March 2021
None on record
Susan Griffin Trustee 18 March 2021
None on record
Anna Wilson Trustee 25 July 2019
THE ISLE OF ELY FEDERATION OF WOMEN'S INSTITUTES CIO
Received: 17 days late
Anne Penelope MAYO Trustee 28 January 2014
None on record
PETER SMITH Trustee
None on record