FEOFFEE OR TOWN ESTATES

Charity number: 204715
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

RELIEF OF POOR

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023

Total income: £12,877
Total expenditure: £13,360

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

Main way of carrying out purposes is grant making
What the charity does:
  • General Charitable Purposes
Who the charity helps:
  • Elderly/old People
  • People With Disabilities
  • Other Defined Groups
  • The General Public/mankind
How the charity helps:
  • Makes Grants To Individuals
  • Makes Grants To Organisations
Where the charity operates:
  • Northamptonshire

Governance

Registration history:
  • 30 April 1962: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Other
Other names:
  • OUNDLE FEOFFEES (Working name)
Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Complaints handling
  • Investment
  • Risk management
  • Volunteer management
Land and property:
This charity owns and/or leases land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

13 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Sian Fytche Trustee 01 November 2022
None on record
Andrew Clive Middleditch Trustee 01 January 2021
SIR WILLIAM LAXTON'S PENSION CHARITY
Received: On time
Justin Dennis Jeffrey Trustee 01 January 2021
SIR WILLIAM LAXTON'S PENSION CHARITY
Received: On time
Philippa Katharin Faith Peile Trustee 01 January 2021
None on record
Tristan George Ashby Trustee 01 January 2021
None on record
Gareth David Brown Trustee 01 January 2021
None on record
Rev Stephen Webster Trustee 07 June 2014
None on record
John Pick Trustee
VOLUNTEER ACTION
Received: On time
SIR WILLIAM LAXTON'S PENSION CHARITY
Received: On time
JOHN ROBERT GENT Trustee
SIR WILLIAM LAXTON'S PENSION CHARITY
Received: On time
IAN GOLDSMITH Trustee
SIR WILLIAM LAXTON'S PENSION CHARITY
Received: On time
PHILIP MICHAEL AMPS Trustee
SIR WILLIAM LAXTON'S PENSION CHARITY
Received: On time
MARGARET BERRY Trustee
SIR WILLIAM LAXTON'S PENSION CHARITY
Received: On time
LEONARD GEORGE JOHNSON Trustee
SIR WILLIAM LAXTON'S PENSION CHARITY
Received: On time

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023
Total gross income £6.10k £7.38k £7.42k £7.58k £12.88k
Total expenditure £6.00k £5.90k £6.87k £6.87k £13.36k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2023 22 July 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2023 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2022 10 October 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2021 03 November 2022 3 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2020 02 November 2021 2 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2019 26 October 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 Not Required
Submit annual return Open in new window

Linked charities

Linked charities
Governing document
INDENTURE OF LEASE AND RELEASE DATED 9/07/1828 AND 10/07/1828
Charitable objects
FOR GENERAL CHARITABLE PURPOSES IN THE AREA OF BENEFIT
Area of benefit
OUNDLE
Registration history
  • 30 April 1962 : Standard registration

Contact information

Address:
4 WEST STREET
OUNDLE
PETERBOROUGH
PE8 4EF
Phone:
01832 273502
Email:
No information available
Website:

No information available