THE FOWEY CHARITIES

Charity Number: 204805
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

Relief of poverty in parish of Fowey, Cornwall

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023

Total income: £1,278
Total expenditure: £840

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

No information available

Trustee payments

No information available

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • General Charitable Purposes
Who the charity helps:
  • Elderly/old People
How the charity helps:
  • Makes Grants To Individuals
Where the charity operates:
  • Cornwall

Governance

Registration history:
  • 11 July 1972: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Other
Other names:

No other names

Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
No policies declared
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

7 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Rev CAROL EDLESTON Trustee 23 September 2024
THE FRIENDS OF ST FIMBARRUS CHURCH FOWEY
Received: On time
Angela Cottrell Trustee 27 September 2022
None on record
Lynn Goold Trustee 19 March 2018
None on record
Elizabeth Tomlin Trustee 17 September 2015
None on record
Maureen MacKenzie Trustee 01 January 2013
None on record
Julie Thurman Trustee 01 January 2013
None on record
PHILIP DE GREY-WARTER Trustee 11 September 2012
FOWEY GRAMMAR SCHOOL FOUNDATION
Received: On time
ANCHOR ANGLICAN CHURCH FOWEY
Received: On time
ANGLICAN CONVOCATION EUROPE
Received: On time

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023
Total gross income £1.19k £1.22k £1.24k £1.27k £1.28k
Total expenditure £1.20k £1.32k £1.20k £1.30k £840
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2023 17 July 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2023 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2022 10 July 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2021 08 March 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2020 08 March 2022 128 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2019 21 September 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 Not Required
Submit annual return Open in new window

Linked charities

Linked charities
Governing document
SCHEME OF 11 JULY 1972
Charitable objects
TO RELIEVE EITHER GENERALLY OR INDIVIDUALLY PERSONS RESIDENT IN THE AREA OF BENEFIT WHO ARE IN CONDITIONS OF NEED HARDSHIP OR DISTRESS.
Area of benefit
FORMER BOROUGH OF FOWEY
Registration history
  • 11 July 1972 : Standard registration

Contact information

Address:
35 Pentreath Close
FOWEY
PL23 1EP
Phone:
07955877071
Email:
No information available
Website:

No information available