WALTHAM ST LAWRENCE CHARITIES

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To promote any charitable purpose in the Parish, the area of benefit. The Charity comprises:1.Foot Knight & Newbery Relief in Need.2.Wandesford & How Educational.3.Beale and Braybrooke Relief in Sickness. The objects are to relieve persons in need, hardship, distress; to promote education and training, with priority to under 25s; and to help those who are sick, convalescent, disabled & infirm.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2024
People

7 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Disability
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Windsor And Maidenhead
Governance
- 18 May 1962: Standard registration
- NEWBERRY, FOOT AND KNIGHT CHARITIES (Previous name)
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Joy Edwina Aldred | Trustee | 22 March 2023 |
|
|
||||
Francesca Claudine Seligman | Trustee | 22 March 2023 |
|
|
||||
Dr Robert Lyman | Trustee | 06 December 2021 |
|
|||||
Jeremy Thomas McEvett | Trustee | 09 January 2018 |
|
|
||||
REVEREND CHARLES MASON | Trustee | 11 September 2016 |
|
|
||||
Polly Pollecut | Trustee | 25 March 2015 |
|
|
||||
NICHOLAS JOHN KOHL | Trustee | 04 August 2011 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | 31/12/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £22.48k | £33.57k | £46.18k | £42.44k | £44.77k | |
|
Total expenditure | £41.77k | £25.99k | £72.57k | £42.16k | £49.38k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2024 | 25 March 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2024 | 25 March 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 25 June 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 25 June 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 24 March 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 24 March 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 13 June 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 13 June 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 20 May 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
SCHEME DATED 18/03/2009 AS AMENDED BY SCHEME DATED 12/04/2011
Charitable objects
THE OBJECTS OF THE CHARITY ARE: (1) TO RELIEVE PERSONS RESIDENT IN THE AREA OF BENEFIT WHO ARE IN NEED, HARDSHIP OR DISTRESS; AND (2) TO RELIEVE PERSONS RESIDENT IN THE AREA OF BENEFIT WHO ARE SICK, CONVALESCENT, DISABLED OR INFIRM BY RELIEVING THEIR SUFFERING OR ASSISTING THEIR RECOVERY. (3) TO PROMOTE THE EDUCATION AND TRAINING OF PERSONS RESIDENT IN THE AREA OF BENEFIT ; PRIORITY WILL BE GIVEN TO THOSE WHO ARE UNDER THE AGE OF 25; AND (4) THE TRUSTEES MAY RELIEVE THOSE ELIGIBLE FOR ASSISTANCE BY: (A) MAKING GRANTS OF MONEY TO THEM; OR (B) PROVIDING OR PAYING FOR GOODS, SERVICES OR FACILITIES FOR THEM; OR (C) MAKING GRANTS OF MONEY TO OTHER PERSONS OR BODIES WHO PROVIDE GOODS, SERVICES OR FACILITIES TO THOSE ELIGIBLE FOR ASSISTANCE. (D) TO PROMOTE ANY CHARITABLE PURPOSE IN THE AREA OF BENEFIT.
Area of benefit
PARISH OF WALTHAM ST LAWRENCE
Linked charities
- 18 May 1962 : Standard registration
Contact information
- Address:
-
1 Paddock View
Broadmoor Road
WALTHAM ST. LAWRENCE
READING
RG10 0RF
- Phone:
- 01189343629
- Email:
- No information available
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window