STOCKBURN MEMORIAL TRUST FUND

Charity number: 205120
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

Financial assistance to people who are both sick and poor residing in the former Borough of Kettering.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 December 2024

Total income: £10,940
Total expenditure: £13,125

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

Main way of carrying out purposes is grant making
What the charity does:
  • The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
  • Disability
  • The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
Who the charity helps:
  • Children/young People
  • Elderly/old People
  • People With Disabilities
How the charity helps:
  • Makes Grants To Individuals
Where the charity operates:
  • Northamptonshire

Governance

Registration history:
  • 03 May 1962: Standard registration
  • 30 January 1995: Removed
Organisation type:
Other
Other names:

No other names

Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Complaints handling
  • Conflicting interests
  • Financial reserves policy and procedures
  • Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
  • Internal risk management policy and procedures
  • Investing charity funds policy and procedures
  • Investment
  • Safeguarding policy and procedures
  • Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
  • Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
  • Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

6 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
James Edward Lamb Chair 03 February 2020
MRS G A H GRUNDY'S CHARITY
Received: On time
THE LAMB (WARKTON) CHARITY
Received: On time
SUNNYLANDS TRUST
Received: On time
WARKTON CHURCH CHARITY
Received: On time
Cllr Beverley Margaret Wright Trustee 15 May 2023
None on record
Cllr Margaret Anne Don Trustee 15 May 2023
None on record
Rev PETER DOUGLAS STRONG Trustee 05 October 2020
TIMSON FAMILY CHARITABLE TRUST
Received: On time
NORTHAM TRUST
Received: On time
Paul Robert Bertin Trustee 03 February 2020
NORTHAMPTONSHIRE AREA QUAKER MEETING OF THE RELIGIOUS SOCIETY OF FRIENDS (QUAKERS) IN BRITAIN
Received: On time
Susan Barbara Watts Trustee 04 February 2019
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023 31/12/2024
Total gross income £12.63k £10.38k £10.67k £10.78k £10.94k
Total expenditure £11.37k £9.02k £11.20k £14.78k £13.13k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2024 18 February 2025 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2024 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2023 20 February 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2023 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2022 10 February 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2021 23 February 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2020 22 April 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 Not Required
Submit annual return Open in new window

Linked charities

Linked charities
Governing document
SCHEME OF 26 OCTOBER 1954
Charitable objects
SUBSIDIARY REMOVED AND AMALGAMATED INTO SUBSIDIARY 2. SEE SCHEME FOR DETAILS FOR THE BENEFIT OF SICK POOR PERSONS RESIDENT IN THE AREA OF BENEFIT
Area of benefit
TOWN OF KETTERING
Registration history
  • 03 May 1962 : Standard registration
  • 30 January 1995 : Removed

Contact information

Address:
Stockburn Memorial Trust Fund
c/o Lamb and Holmes
West Street
Kettering
Northamptonshire
NN16 0AZ
Phone:
07528022611