WAPPENHAM POOR'S LAND CHARITY

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The Trustees oversee the care and management of the Charity's assets and distributes funds to the Wappenham Poors and Church Charities as recommended or requested by their Trustees.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 October 2023
People

5 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Other Defined Groups
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Northamptonshire
Governance
- 10 May 1962: Standard registration
No other names
- Investment
- Risk management
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
MICHAEL NORMAN SHEPPARD | Chair |
|
|
|||||
Christopher Raven | Trustee | 01 October 2015 |
|
|
||||
JOHN PETER SHEPHERD | Trustee | 04 September 2012 |
|
|
||||
DANIEL BARRY HAYCOCK | Trustee |
|
||||||
FRANK ALAN OSBORNE | Trustee |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/10/2019 | 31/10/2020 | 31/10/2021 | 31/10/2022 | 31/10/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £4.71k | £4.14k | £3.97k | £3.60k | £5.09k | |
|
Total expenditure | £6.17k | £5.45k | £5.46k | £674 | £5.72k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 October 2023 | 12 March 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 October 2022 | 26 July 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 October 2021 | 07 September 2022 | 7 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 October 2020 | 03 March 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 October 2019 | 02 January 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
INCLOSURE AWARD MADE UNDER 1 GEORGE 111. C.26 SEE P.R.14 P.300
Charitable objects
RELIEF OF POOR OF WAPPENHAM
Area of benefit
PARISH OF WAPPENHAM
Contact information
- Address:
-
College Farm
College Lane
Woodend
TOWCESTER
NN12 8RY
- Phone:
- 01327860268
- Email:
- frankosbornefarm@gmail.com
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window