Financial history SHEBBEAR PARISH LANDS CHARITY

Charity Number: 205183
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023 31/12/2024
Total gross income £2.28k £2.33k £2.39k £2.40k £2.43k
Total expenditure £2.06k £2.08k £2.16k £6.46k £2.17k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A