SONNING AND DISTRICT WELFARE AND EDUCATIONAL TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Welfare support for individuals in need or distress
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2024
People

12 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- People With Disabilities
- Other Defined Groups
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Oxfordshire
- Wokingham
Governance
- 18 June 1976: Standard registration
- SONNING AND DISTRICT WELFARE TRUST (Previous name)
- Complaints handling
- Investment
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
12 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Rev JAMIE TAYLOR | Chair |
|
||||||
KATRIN LISA HARDING | Trustee | 31 May 2024 |
|
|
||||
Anthony Walker | Trustee | 18 October 2023 |
|
|
||||
Bethan J OWEN | Trustee | 17 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
Philip Sherwood | Trustee | 01 September 2022 |
|
|||||
Hilary Jones | Trustee | 01 June 2022 |
|
|
||||
DARREN SMITH | Trustee | 27 June 2014 |
|
|
||||
SUSAN BRADLEY | Trustee | 21 March 2012 |
|
|
||||
JUDY BALDWIN | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
DAVID WOODWARD | Trustee |
|
||||||
Jane Diwell | Trustee |
|
||||||
PENNY FEATHERS | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | 31/12/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £3.92k | £1.87k | £1.87k | £1.84k | £1.97k | |
|
Total expenditure | £2.28k | £1.82k | £1.82k | £2.28k | £1.26k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2024 | 15 March 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 01 September 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 31 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 07 March 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 05 August 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
SCHEME OF 18 JUNE 1976 AS AMENDED BY SCHEME OF 26TH AUGUST 1993 AS AMENDED BY RESOLUTION DATED 24 JUNE 2009 AND 9 SEPTEMBER 2009
Charitable objects
TO PROVIDE ASSISTANCE TO INDIVIDUALS UNDER 25 YEARS WHO ARE IN FULL TIME EDUCATION, WHO IN THE OPINION OF THE TRUSTEES ARE IN NEED OF FINANCIAL ASSISTANCE
Area of benefit
SEE OBJECTS
Contact information
- Address:
-
School Cottage
Thames Street
Sonning
Reading
RG4 6UR
- Phone:
- 01189693741
- Email:
- sue.bradley@btinternet.com
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window