WORCESTERSHIRE HISTORICAL SOCIETY

Charity Number: 205616
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

The advancement of education of the public with regard to the historic diocese and county of Worcester, and in particular to publish and disseminate original material relating thereto. Activities include the publishing and distribution of historic texts, lectures, book launchs and the maintenance of a web site.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023

Total income: £4,195
Total expenditure: £3,321

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

No information available

Trustee payments

No information available

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Arts/culture/heritage/science
  • Environment/conservation/heritage
Who the charity helps:
  • The General Public/mankind
How the charity helps:
  • Provides Advocacy/advice/information
Where the charity operates:
  • Worcestershire

Governance

Registration history:
  • 08 May 1962: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Other
Other names:

No other names

Gift aid:
Recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
No policies declared
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

13 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Professor Peter Roderick Coss Chair 26 March 2021
THE DUGDALE SOCIETY
Received: On time
Professor Dilwyn Porter Trustee 12 October 2024
THE BRITISH SOCIETY OF SPORTS HISTORY
Charity reporting is overdue by 19 days
Paige Joy Trustee 12 October 2024
None on record
Dr Wendy Toon Trustee 15 October 2022
None on record
sylvia joy morgan Trustee 15 October 2022
LEEK WOOTTON CHURCH OF ENGLAND V A PRIMARY COMMUNITY SCHOOL TRUST
Received: On time
ROBIN WHITTAKER Trustee 26 March 2021
THE FRIENDS OF PERSHORE ABBEY CIO
Received: On time
FRIENDS OF WORCESTERSHIRE ARCHIVES
Received: On time
WORCESTERSHIRE ARCHAEOLOGICAL SOCIETY
Received: On time
THE FRIENDS OF COLERIDGE
Received: On time
DR ADRIAN STUART GREGSON Trustee 07 December 2012
None on record
MARGARET METCALFE GOODRICH Trustee 28 June 2011
THE FRIENDS OF PERSHORE ABBEY CIO
Received: On time
Dr Stephen Kenneth Roberts Trustee
THE DUGDALE SOCIETY
Received: On time
HONOURABLE SOCIETY OF CYMMRODORION
Received: On time
PERKINS'S EDUCATIONAL FOUNDATION
Received: On time
Dr ANDREW HOPPER Trustee
None on record
PROFESSOR CHRISTOPHER CHARLES DYER CBE, FBA Trustee
MEDIEVAL SETTLEMENT RESEARCH GROUP
Received: On time
THE HEREFORDSHIRE VICTORIA COUNTY HISTORY TRUST
Received: On time
LEICESTERSHIRE VICTORIA COUNTY HISTORY TRUST
Received: On time
DR PAT HUGHES Trustee
FRIENDS OF WORCESTERSHIRE ARCHIVES
Received: On time
Peter Walker Trustee
FRIENDS OF WORCESTERSHIRE ARCHIVES
Received: On time

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023
Total gross income £7.93k £3.46k £5.60k £3.92k £4.20k
Total expenditure £8.64k £1.00k £7.18k £1.98k £3.32k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2023 27 October 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2023 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2022 24 October 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2021 16 October 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2020 05 October 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2019 07 September 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 Not Required
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
2,the howsells
malvern
WR14 1AD
Phone:
01886832732