THE CITY AND METROPOLITAN WELFARE CHARITY
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
With the formal approval of the Charity Commission, the charity is winding itself up, and the trustees have agreed the other charities to which it is now (October 2024) dispersing its capital endowment. Consequently the City and Metropolitan Welfare Charity has effectively closed down and is no longer accepting applications for grants.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Throughout London
Governance
- 25 September 1961: Standard registration
- 25 February 2025: Removed (Funds transferred (gi))
- 25 February 2025: Funds transferred to 1051388 THE AMBER FOUNDATION
- 25 February 2025: Funds transferred to 1148824 CHANGE FOR GOOD COMMUNITY CHAPLAINCY LIMITED
- 25 February 2025: Funds transferred to 1183092 CHILDREN'S BOOK PROJECT
- 25 February 2025: Funds transferred to 1098118 The Hardman Trust
- 25 February 2025: Funds transferred to 1166057 LANDWORKS
- 25 February 2025: Funds transferred to 1174202 PRISON CHOIR PROJECT
- 25 February 2025: Funds transferred to 1114760 PRISON RADIO ASSOCIATION
- 25 February 2025: Funds transferred to 1093710 PRISONERS ABROAD
- 25 February 2025: Funds transferred to 1128372 SOUTH WEST COMMUNITY CHAPLAINCY LIMITED
- 25 February 2025: Funds transferred to 1177813 STANDOUT PROGRAMMES
- 25 February 2025: Funds transferred to 1004354 THE UPPER ROOM (ST SAVIOUR'S)
- 25 February 2025: Funds transferred to 1131802 WORKING CHANCE LTD
No other names
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £37.31k | £35.60k | £32.35k | £35.99k | £31.21k | |
|
Total expenditure | £41.13k | £38.13k | £33.63k | £39.17k | £44.36k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 16 April 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 16 April 2024 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 17 April 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 17 April 2023 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 19 April 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 19 April 2022 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 28 April 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 28 April 2021 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 03 April 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 03 April 2020 | On Time |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
SCHEME OF 25 SEPTEMBER 1961
Charitable objects
FOR THE BENEFIT OF DESERVING PERSONS WHO BY REASON OF AGE, ILL HEALTH, ACCIDENT, INFIRMITY OR STRAITENED FINANCIAL CIRCUMSTANCES ARE IN NEED OF ASSISTANCE IN EITHER OR BOTH OF THE FOLLOWING WAYS: (1) IN THE SUPPLY OF ARTICLES IN KIND OR IN GRANTS OF MONEY. (2) IN GRANTS IN AID OF THE FUNDS OF ANY INSTITUTIONS OR ORGANISATIONS ESTABLISHED OR TO BE ESTABLISHED FOR THE CARE AND RELIEF OF SUCH PERSONS, WITH A PREFERENCE FOR INSTITUTIONS OR ORGANISATIONS WHICH ARE ADMINISTERED IN OR IN CONNEXION WITH THE CITY OF LONDON.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window