GIBSON WALDEN FUND

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Supports the charitable activities of The Gibson Library, The King Edward VI Almshouses, The Saffron Walden Museum and other charities local to Saffron Walden and its people.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

7 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Disability
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Other Charitable Purposes
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Essex
Governance
- 12 October 1962: Standard registration
- GIBSON SAFFRON WALDEN FUND (Previous name)
- Conflicting interests
- Investment
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Gillian Shirley Williamson | Trustee | 07 February 2024 |
|
|||||
David Kynaston OBE | Trustee | 23 October 2023 |
|
|
||||
Martin Stuart Turnbull | Trustee | 27 July 2017 |
|
|
||||
Malcolm Dennis White | Trustee | 27 July 2017 |
|
|
||||
HOWARD CARL NEWMAN | Trustee |
|
||||||
ADRIAN JOHN STENTON | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
LUCY CATHERINE BANKS | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £2.64k | £2.69k | £2.74k | £2.80k | £2.81k | |
|
Total expenditure | £2.56k | £2.62k | £2.65k | £2.77k | £2.40k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 31 August 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 09 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 21 July 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 07 July 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 06 July 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
THE WILL OF GEORGE STACEY GIBSON PROVED IN THE PRINCIPAL RESISTRY ON THE 5TH SEPTEMBER 1883
Charitable objects
THE BENEFIT OF ONE OR MORE OF THE FOLLOWING INSTITUTIONS IN SAFFRON WALDEN, THE HOSPITAL, THE BRITISH SCHOOLS, THE MUSEUM, THE PUBLIC LIBRARY AND THE ALMSHOUSE AND THE OTHER CHARITABLE INSTITUTIONS OF THE SAME TOWN, BUT WITH POWER FOR THE TRUSTEES TO APPLY ONE FOURTH PART AT THEIR DISCRETION TO THE RELIEF OF PERSON OR PERSONS WHO HAVE RESIDED IN THE TOWN FOR AT LEAST TEN CONSECUTIVE YEARS.
Area of benefit
BOROUGH OF SAFFRON WALDEN
Contact information
- Address:
-
GREEN FARM HOUSE
LITTLEBURY GREEN
SAFFRON WALDEN
CB11 4XB
- Phone:
- 01763838600
- Email:
- lynda.gray26@outlook.com
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window