THE LONDON AGED CHRISTIAN SOCIETY

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
This society functions to give small grants to mainly christian churches to assist them with practical care for the elderly. This usually applies to extra assistance in winter also for summer excursions in summer. It includes grants for counselling visiting and advice and vehicles. We also give to other charities.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 April 2024
People

4 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Disability
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Religious Activities
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Throughout London
Governance
- 22 September 1962: Standard registration
No other names
- Investment
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
REV PAUL MARTIN REED | Chair |
|
|
|||||
Stephanie Jane Ellner | Trustee | 23 June 2023 |
|
|||||
Lorna Patricia Beaumont | Trustee | 13 November 2020 |
|
|
||||
Carys Woodbridge | Trustee | 24 June 2016 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/04/2020 | 30/04/2021 | 30/04/2022 | 30/04/2023 | 30/04/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £5.28k | £1.63k | £1.38k | £880 | £1.77k | |
|
Total expenditure | £2.47k | £2.42k | £1.87k | £1.46k | £1.08k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 April 2024 | 28 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 April 2023 | 25 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 April 2022 | 30 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 April 2021 | 15 September 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 April 2020 | 06 November 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
RULES AS AMENDED 14TH SEPTEMBER 1992
Charitable objects
RELIEF OF THE CHRISTIAN POOR OF EITHER SEX WHO HAVE ATTAINED THE AGE OF 55 YEARS.
Area of benefit
WITHIN 7 MILES OF ST. PAUL'S CATHEDRAL LONDON
Contact information
- Address:
-
15 Avis Square
LONDON
E1 0QD
- Phone:
- 02077906885
- Email:
- caryswb@yahoo.com
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window