Financial history THE WOMEN'S ROYAL ARMY CORPS ASSOCIATION (INCORPORATING QUEEN MARY'S ARMY AUXILIARY CORPS AND AUXILIARY TERRITORIAL SERVICE COMRADES ASSOCIATION)

Charity number: 206184
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/09/2020 30/09/2021 30/09/2022 30/09/2023 30/09/2024
Total gross income £325.73k £278.35k £330.84k £347.36k £525.88k
Total expenditure £514.57k £406.42k £510.87k £600.69k £652.70k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income - Donations and legacies N/A N/A N/A N/A £283.33k
Income - Other trading activities N/A N/A N/A N/A £0
Income - Charitable activities N/A N/A N/A N/A £763
Income - Endowments N/A N/A N/A N/A £0
Income - Investment N/A N/A N/A N/A £236.38k
Income - Other N/A N/A N/A N/A £5.41k
Income - Legacies N/A N/A N/A N/A £145.91k
Expenditure - Charitable activities N/A N/A N/A N/A £625.14k
Expenditure - Raising funds N/A N/A N/A N/A £27.56k
Expenditure - Governance N/A N/A N/A N/A £22.05k
Expenditure - Grants institution N/A N/A N/A N/A £217.35k
Expenditure - Investment management N/A N/A N/A N/A £27.56k
Expenditure - Other N/A N/A N/A N/A £0