ELIZABETH COOK'S CHARITY

Charity Number: 206398
Charity reporting is overdue by 568 days

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

Income donated to Stansted Trust Funds and distributed to the "poor and needy" of the village.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 December 2021

Total income: £38
Total expenditure: £20

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

No information available

Trustee payments

No information available

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
Who the charity helps:
  • The General Public/mankind
How the charity helps:
  • Makes Grants To Individuals
Where the charity operates:
  • Essex

Governance

Registration history:
  • 22 September 1962: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Other
Other names:

No other names

Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Risk management
  • Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

3 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Rev Colin Fairweather Trustee 01 June 2021
CHARITY OF HENRIETTA C RAYNSFORTH
Received: On time
CHARITY OF MARIA BRENT
Received: On time
KITTY RUSH'S CHARITY
Received: On time
CHARITY OF DIONYSIUS PALMER
Received: On time
STANSTED EMERGENCY WAR FUND
Received: On time
Margaret Carol Hill Trustee 04 April 2019
KITTY RUSH'S CHARITY
Received: On time
CHARITY OF DIONYSIUS PALMER
Received: On time
CHARITY OF MARIA BRENT
Received: On time
STANSTED EMERGENCY WAR FUND
Received: On time
ELIZABETH COOKE ( ALIAS CHAPMAN ) AND GERTRUDE PECK
Received: On time
CHARITY OF HENRIETTA C RAYNSFORTH
Received: On time
CHRISTINE STILES Trustee 06 June 2012
CHARITY OF HENRIETTA C RAYNSFORTH
Received: On time
ELIZABETH COOKE ( ALIAS CHAPMAN ) AND GERTRUDE PECK
Received: On time
CHARITY OF MARIA BRENT
Received: On time
STANSTED EMERGENCY WAR FUND
Received: On time
KITTY RUSH'S CHARITY
Received: On time
CHARITY OF DIONYSIUS PALMER
Received: On time
CHARITY OF ROBERT BUCK
Received: On time

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021
Total gross income £35 £120 £36 £36 £38
Total expenditure £66 £58 £40 £22 £20
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2023 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 202 days
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2023 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 202 days
Annual return 31 December 2022 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 568 days
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2022 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 568 days
Annual return 31 December 2021 11 October 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2020 10 March 2022 130 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2019 13 November 2020 13 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 Not Required
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
4 HARGRAVE CLOSE
STANSTED
CM24 8DL
Phone:
01279814706
Email:
No information available
Website:

No information available