Financial history ROYAL NORFOLK REGIMENT ASSOCIATION FUND

Charity Number: 206593
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023 31/12/2024
Total gross income £5.39k £5.22k £6.04k £7.60k £14.03k
Total expenditure £7.20k £5.01k £8.15k £10.51k £10.01k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A