Trustees THE WHITE ENSIGN ASSOCIATION LIMITED
Charity Number: 206787

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
15 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Robert Constant | Trustee | 20 March 2025 |
|
|
||||
Admiral Sir Timothy Fraser | Trustee | 20 March 2025 |
|
|
||||
Lindsey Gilchrist | Trustee | 20 March 2025 |
|
|
||||
Toby Ellison | Trustee | 20 March 2024 |
|
|
||||
Dame Ruth Cairnie | Trustee | 20 July 2021 |
|
|
||||
Theocharis Panayiotou Theochari | Trustee | 15 July 2021 |
|
|
||||
Caroline Philippa Haughey OBE QC | Trustee | 15 July 2021 |
|
|
||||
Admiral Sir Philip Andrew Jones GCB DL | Trustee | 14 November 2019 |
|
|
||||
Lieutenant General Edward Grant Martin Davis CB CBE | Trustee | 14 November 2019 |
|
|
||||
Commodore Robert William Dorey RFA | Trustee | 14 November 2019 |
|
|
||||
Commodore Inga Jane Kennedy CBE QHNS | Trustee | 15 November 2018 |
|
|
||||
James Michael Ross Saunders Watson DL | Trustee | 15 November 2017 |
|
|
||||
Admiral Sir George Michael Zambellas GCB DSC DL | Trustee | 16 November 2016 |
|
|
||||
Captain Lance Henry Lowe Batchelor RNR | Trustee | 12 November 2014 |
|
|
||||
Captain Adam Gosling RNR | Trustee |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.