THE CRANFIELD COURT CHARITY

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Provision of rented accommodation for retired persons.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 August 2024
People

8 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Accommodation/housing
- Elderly/old People
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Suffolk
Governance
- 22 September 1962: Standard registration
No other names
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
8 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
RICHARD HAWKINS | Chair |
|
|
|||||
Alison Jayne Farthing | Trustee | 01 October 2023 |
|
|
||||
G J L EVANS | Trustee | 01 August 2019 |
|
|
||||
DR Donald J McEllinney | Trustee | 20 March 2017 |
|
|
||||
DAVID HUGHES | Trustee | 13 February 2013 |
|
|||||
INGA LOCKINGTON | Trustee | 13 February 2013 |
|
|
||||
MARY GASKIN | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
VALERIE ARMSTRONG | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/08/2020 | 31/08/2021 | 31/08/2022 | 31/08/2023 | 31/08/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £204.55k | £221.31k | £221.60k | £230.28k | £238.62k | |
|
Total expenditure | £222.07k | £152.32k | £173.69k | £264.93k | £212.40k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 August 2024 | 03 December 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2024 | 03 December 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2023 | 21 December 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2023 | 21 December 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2022 | 19 December 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2022 | 19 December 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2021 | 25 November 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2021 | 25 November 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2020 | 11 December 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2020 | 11 December 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
DEED OF FOUNDATION DATED 14TH SEPTEMBER 1938
Charitable objects
HOMES OR RESIDENCES FOR THE BENEFIT OF DESERVING POOR PERSONS OF GOOD CHARACTER AND EDUCATION WHO BY REASON OF AGE, INFIRMITY MISADVENTURE ADVERSITY OR OTHERWISE ARE IN REDUCED CIRCUMSTANCES AND OR IN SPECIAL NEED OF HELP OR ASSISTANCE.
Area of benefit
IPSWICH AND ELSEWHERE
Contact information
- Address:
-
1 ARMSTRONG HOUSE
CHELSWORTH AVENUE
IPSWICH
IP4 3BA
- Phone:
- 01473400205
- Email:
- cranfieldcourt789@gmail.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window