THE INSTITUTION OF MECHANICAL ENGINEERS

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Improving the world through engineering, specifically as per the Royal Charter: The objects and purposes for which the institution is hereby constituted are to promote the development of Mechanical Engineering and to facilitate the exchange of information and ideas thereon?
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
Total income:
£30,248,000
Donations and legacies | £22.00k | |
Charitable activities | £18.86m | |
Other trading activities | £10.11m | |
Investments | £795.00k | |
Other | £465.00k |
Total expenditure:
£29,065,000
Raising funds | £10.00m | |
Charitable activities | £19.07m | |
Other | £0 |
£234,000 investments gains (losses)
Charitable expenditure
Charitable expenditure with investment gains
Charitable expenditure
Some charities generate all, or a substantial part, of their income from investments which may have been donated to the charity as endowment or set aside by the charity from its own resources in the past. Such investments usually take the form of stocks and shares but may include other assets, such as property, that are capable of generating income and/or capital growth.
In managing their spending and investments charities need to strike a balance between the needs of future and current beneficiaries. They also need to take account of spending commitments that may stretch over a number of future years. To do this, charities will normally adopt an investment strategy designed to generate both income and capital growth. To maximise returns trustees may commit to investment strategies for several years.
Investments can experience large swings in value so trustees may, in a particular year, decide to realise and spend part of their charity’s capital or to invest part of its income.
By clicking the investment gains checkbox the charitable spending bar is adjusted to take account of capital growth as well as income. This shows the balance the charity is striking, between spending on current beneficiaries and retaining resources for future beneficiaries.
Raising funds and other expenditure | £10.00m | |
Charitable expenditure | £19.07m | |
Retained for future use | £1.18m |
Raising funds and other expenditure | £10.00m | |
Charitable expenditure | £19.07m | |
Retained for future use | £1.42m |
People

227 Employee(s)
15 Trustee(s)
6006 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
Number of employees | |
---|---|
£60k to £70k | 16 |
£70k to £80k | 13 |
£80k to £90k | 4 |
£90k to £100k | 6 |
£100k to £110k | 1 |
£110k to £120k | 1 |
£120k to £130k | 1 |
£130k to £140k | 1 |
£150k to £200k | 2 |
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Economic/community Development/employment
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Throughout England And Wales
- Hong Kong
- Malaysia
- Scotland
Governance
- 29 July 1963: Standard registration
- I M E C H E (Working name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
14 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Adrian Waldock | Trustee | 18 October 2024 |
|
|
||||
Peter Lee | Trustee | 27 August 2024 |
|
|
||||
Chanaka Wanniarachchi | Trustee | 27 September 2023 |
|
|
||||
Darren Sharpe | Trustee | 23 May 2024 |
|
|
||||
Christopher O'Boyle | Trustee | 13 February 2024 |
|
|
||||
Abbey Addison | Trustee | 14 July 2023 |
|
|
||||
Joshua Thomson-Smith | Trustee | 26 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
Simon Evans | Trustee | 25 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
Matthew Garside | Trustee | 25 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
Chris Chong | Trustee | 25 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
Ruth Shilston | Trustee | 25 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
Clive Hickman OBE | Trustee | 25 May 2022 |
|
|||||
Dr Richard Charles Bartlett Judge CEng | Trustee | 15 June 2021 |
|
|
||||
Dr David Nowell CEng | Trustee | 22 May 2019 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £27.93m | £21.93m | £22.60m | £28.71m | £30.25m | |
|
Total expenditure | £25.33m | £20.98m | £21.86m | £28.52m | £29.07m | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | £90.00k | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Donations and legacies | £17.00k | £72.00k | £113.00k | £21.00k | £22.00k | |
|
Income - Other trading activities | £10.50m | £6.46m | £6.35m | £10.68m | £10.11m | |
|
Income - Charitable activities | £14.92m | £13.67m | £14.90m | £16.79m | £18.86m | |
|
Income - Endowments | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Investment | £613.00k | £1.33m | £637.00k | £701.00k | £795.00k | |
|
Income - Other | £1.89m | £399.00k | £597.00k | £528.00k | £465.00k | |
|
Income - Legacies | £17.00k | £72.00k | £113.00k | £21.00k | £22.00k | |
|
Expenditure - Charitable activities | £14.44m | £13.31m | £14.84m | £17.16m | £19.07m | |
|
Expenditure - Raising funds | £10.90m | £7.67m | £7.03m | £11.36m | £10.00m | |
|
Expenditure - Governance | £2.02m | £441.00k | £2.40m | £2.70m | £3.38m | |
|
Expenditure - Grants institution | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Investment management | £9.00k | £9.00k | £10.00k | £16.00k | £15.00k | |
|
Expenditure - Other | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 |
Assets and liabilities
Definitions for assets and liabilities
These are assets, other than investments, which are held for more than 12 months and used to run and administer the charity such as buildings, offices, exhibits and fixtures and fittings.
Long term InvestmentsInvestments are assets held by the charity with the sole aim of generating income which will be used for their charitable purposes such as deposit accounts, shares, rental property and unit trusts.
Investment assets are re-valued every year and included in the balance sheet at their current market value.
Long term investments are held for more than 12 months.
These are assets held generally for less than 12 months such as cash and bank balances, debtors, investments to be sold within the coming year and trading stock.
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liabilityThis is a surplus or deficit in any defined benefit pension scheme operated and represents a potential long-term asset or liability.
Total liabilitiesThese are all the amounts owed by the charity at the balance sheet date to third parties such as bills due but not yet paid, bank overdrafts and loans and mortgages.
Asset / Liability | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Own use assets | £9.83m | £10.31m | £9.83m | £9.34m | £8.75m | |
|
Long-term investments | £20.19m | £20.99m | £22.78m | £21.24m | £21.29m | |
|
Other assets | £9.44m | £8.76m | £10.63m | £11.12m | £13.06m | |
|
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability | -£2.63m | -£9.53m | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Total liabilities | £8.22m | £7.16m | £8.09m | £8.25m | £8.53m |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 24 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 24 October 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 31 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 31 October 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 18 August 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 18 August 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 06 August 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 06 August 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 16 November 2020 | 16 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 16 November 2020 | 16 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
ROYAL CHARTER OF 22 APRIL 1930 AS AMENDED 21 DECEMBER 1946, 13 MAY 1954 AND BY-LAWS AND AMENDED 4 MARCH 1968, 21 APRIL 1980, 11 NOVEMBER 1980, 30 JULY 1982 AND 6TH JANUARY 1998 28 MAY 2014
Charitable objects
TO PROMOTE THE DEVELOPMENT OF MECHANICAL ENGINEERING. (FOR DETAILS PLEASE SEE PARAGRAPH 7 OF THE ROYAL CHARTER).
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Linked charities
- BRUCE BALL NATIONAL CERTIFICATE PRIZE FUND
- C W BATE CROSSLEY SCHOLARSHIP
- INSTITUTION OF MECHANICAL ENGINEERS TRUST FOR EDUCATION AND RESEARCH
- JAMES BATES FUND
- JAMES WATT INTERNATIONAL MEDAL FUND
- JOSEPH BRAMAH FUND
- PAUL HENDERSON MEMORIAL PRIZE
- POUNDER NATIONAL CERTIFICATE PRIZE FUND
- THE BRYAN DONKIN FUND
- THE GENERAL FUND
- THE GRADUATES' AWARD
- THE GRESHAM COOKE FUND
- THE JAMES CLAYTON TRUST FUND
- THE PRESIDENT'S PRIZE TO GRADUATES AND STUDENTS
- THE RESEARCH AND DEVELOPMENT TRUST OF THE INSTITUTION OF MECHANICAL ENGINEERS
- THE SPENCER WILKS TRUST
- THE TRIBOLOGY AWARD FUND
- THE VISCOUNT WEIR FUND
- THOMAS BERNARD HALL FUND
- THOMAS LOWE GRAY FUND
- 29 July 1963 : Standard registration
Contact information
- Address:
-
INSTITUTION OF MECHANICAL ENGINEERS
1 BIRDCAGE WALK
LONDON
SW1H 9JJ
- Phone:
- 02073046862
- Email:
- enquiries@imeche.org
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window